POITIERS CARE

Charity number: 1141270
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/01/2016 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020
Total gross income £11.93k £15.32k £18.52k £15.50k £12.83k
Total expenditure £7.57k £7.49k £13.22k £17.18k £15.57k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A