ALCOHOL RESEARCH UK

Charity number: 1140287
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
William Roger Henry Haydock Trustee 18 March 2019
NEW DIRECTIONS IN THE STUDY OF ALCOHOL GROUP Received: On time
Michael Charles Bellamy Trustee 18 March 2019 None on record
Ranjeet Singh Kaile Trustee 18 March 2020 None on record
Fiyaz Mughal OBE Chair 06 April 2020
MUSLIMS AGAINST ANTISEMITISM Recently registered
THE JERUSALEM INTEREST-FREE MICROFINANCE FUND LIMITED Received: On time
OXFORD RESEARCH GROUP Received: 109 days late
Professor Isabelle Teresa Danuta Szmigin Trustee 18 March 2019 None on record
Adam Patrick Uttley Trustee 14 June 2021 None on record
Vivienne Marion Evans OBE Trustee 18 March 2020
SIR HALLEY STEWART TRUST Received: On time
Dr Emmert Roberts Trustee 18 March 2019
FACULTY OF SEXUAL AND REPRODUCTIVE HEALTHCARE OF THE ROYAL COLLEGE OF OBSTETRICIANS AND GYNAECOLOGISTS Received: On time
Gareth James Harkin Trustee 28 July 2016 None on record
Professor Anthony Moss Trustee 18 March 2019 None on record
Dr EMILY FINCH Trustee 01 May 2017
GAMCARE Received: On time