CHARLES DICKENS CENTRE (GAD'S HILL) LIMITED

Charity Number: 1140957
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To raise funds to conserve and restore Gad's Hill Place to reflect how it was at the time Charles Dickens owned and lived here. To open Gad's Hill Place as a museum for the general public, and impart information to about the life of Charles Dickens. To commerate memorable events in Charles Dickens life at Gad's Hill Place. To work with Gravesham and Medway council in promoting Charles Dickens

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £469
Total expenditure: £190

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 March 2011: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • GAD'S HILL PLACE HOME OF CHARLES DICKENS (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MARION DICKENS Chair
None on record
Sir David Hugh Wootton Trustee 02 September 2011
MORDEN COLLEGE
Received: On time
THE CITY ARTS TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
THE JESUS COLLEGE BOAT CLUB TRUST
Received: On time
CROSS SECTOR SAFETY AND SECURITY COMMUNICATIONS
Received: On time
THE WOOLMEN'S COMPANY CHARITABLE INCORPORATED ORGANISATION
Received: On time
BOWYERS CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE LORD MAYOR'S 800TH ANNIVERSARY AWARDS TRUST
Received: On time
THE WORSHIPFUL COMPANY OF WOOLMEN SUSTAINABILITY START-UP & INNOVATION FUND LIMITED
Charity reporting is overdue by 21 days
THE ROCHESTER CATHEDRAL TRUST
Received: On time
ROYAL BENEVOLENT AND EDUCATIONAL FUND FOR WATERMEN AND LIGHTERMEN
Received: On time
THE COMPANY OF WATERMEN AND LIGHTERMEN OF THE RIVER THAMES POORS FUND
Received: On time
CHRISTOPHER SPREE Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £3.53k £1.66k £10 £0 £469
Total expenditure £1.54k £1.92k £285 £191 £190
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 28 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 05 September 2023 67 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 30 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 30 June 2022 365 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 30 June 2022 730 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Gad's Hill School
Gads Hill Place
Gravesend Road,Higham
ROCHESTER
Kent
ME3 7PA
Phone:
01474822366