Accounts and annual returns CLIFTON RANGERS YFC

Charity number: 1141050
Charity reporting is overdue by 1699 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 238 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 238 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 603 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 603 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 968 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 968 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1333 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1333 days
Annual return 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1699 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1699 days