ACUPUNCTURE AID

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Barefoot Clinics pursues activities to relieve suffering and undertake community development. a) Provide healthcare in remote, impoverished areas in India and Nepal b) Advancement of health & healing with the promotion of sustainable acupuncture clinics c) Provide professional training in acupuncture skills and clinic management, to local and indigenous peoples
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- India
- Nepal
Governance
- 26 August 2011: Standard registration
- STARTED AS BAREFOOT DOCTOR CLINICS (Working name)
- BAREFOOT ACUPUNCTURE CLINICS (Previous name)
- BAREFOOT CLINICS (Previous name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LEILANI LEA, BAc,LicAc,MFEMTC | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.17k | £400 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 10 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 10 April 2025 | 345 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 10 April 2025 | 711 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 13 May 2021 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20/07/2011 AS AMENDED ON 19/08/2011 AS AMENDED ON 26 AUG 2017
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH AND THE SAVING OF LIVES, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND FOR THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED, DISADVANTAGED BY ILL HEALTH AND POVERTY. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND HEALTH EDUCATION, BY TRAINING LOCALS TO RUN THE CLINICS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Portland Place
Bath
BA1 2RU
- Phone:
- 07808200020
- Email:
- LEA.LEILANI@GMAIL.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window