Accounts and annual returns SPUC EDUCATION AND RESEARCH TRUST

Charity number: 1143342
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2021 05 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 23 November 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 29 February 2020 11 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 17 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2019 16 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 16 December 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2018 11 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 11 December 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2017 23 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2017 23 November 2017 On time Download Open in new window