FOX CARNIVAL

Charity number: 1142025
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £31.83k £41.21k £19.04k £25.09k £8.90k
Total expenditure £31.20k £39.56k £19.51k £24.52k £10.87k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £20.70k £0 N/A N/A N/A