MOOJI FOUNDATION LTD

Charity number: 1144016
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £1.88m £464.05k £1.50m £618.15k £689.41k
Total expenditure £1.54m £514.92k £1.08m £834.67k £705.50k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £522.86k N/A £587.19k £401.35k £463.00k
Income - Other trading activities £458.46k N/A £237.81k £216.21k £225.95k
Income - Charitable activities £890.09k N/A £651.34k £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £878 N/A £309 £592 £0
Income - Other £7.44k N/A £18.88k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £848.69k N/A £998.17k £580.63k £562.10k
Expenditure - Raising funds £148.16k N/A £86.73k £254.03k £66.81k
Expenditure - Governance £24.16k N/A £146.41k £161.65k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £824.53k N/A £358.55k £418.99k £549.30k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £547.76k N/A £0 £0 £76.58k