Accounts and annual returns THE TURNER HUDSON RETIRED CLERGY FUND

Charity number: 501629
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 18 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 21 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 25 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 24 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 15 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required