Financial history THE TURNER HUDSON RETIRED CLERGY FUND

Charity number: 501629
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £2.61k £2.82k £2.90k £2.89k £2.54k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £750 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A