THE BRIZEN YOUNG PEOPLE'S CENTRE

Charity number: 1143826
Charity reporting is up to date (57 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £12.68k £21.91k £8.30k £14.03k £11.61k
Total expenditure £11.37k £14.24k £14.63k £10.44k £9.34k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £6.00k £6.50k N/A N/A £10.45k