THE BRIZEN YOUNG PEOPLE'S CENTRE

Charity number: 1143826
Charity reporting is up to date (57 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Angela Swales Trustee 01 April 2016 None on record
JODIE UNDERHILL Trustee 16 September 2011 None on record
Tony Oliver Trustee 01 April 2019 None on record
Ruth Wetherilt Trustee 17 June 2014
GREATFIELD PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION Received: On time
Margaret Emma Frances Nelson Trustee 01 April 2019 None on record
COUNCILLOR ANNE REGAN Trustee 16 September 2011 None on record
John Izamis Trustee 01 April 2014
ST PHILIP AND ST JAMES PLAYGROUP Overdue by 108 days
ALLAN RONALD KNIGHT Trustee 24 July 2011 None on record