Accounts and annual returns Opus 2

Charity number: 1141323
Charity reporting is overdue by 104 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 May 2023 Overdue Overdue by 104 days
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2023 Overdue Overdue by 104 days
Annual return 01 May 2022 26 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2022 Not Required
Annual return 01 May 2021 02 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 May 2020 22 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2020 Not Required
Annual return 01 May 2019 20 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2019 Not Required