THREE TREES COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1140924
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 14 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 14 September 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 04 November 2020 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 04 November 2020 4 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 19 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 19 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 28 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 28 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 03 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 03 August 2017 On time Download