THREE TREES COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1140924
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £462.19k £308.00k £102.22k £76.95k £160.78k
Total expenditure £389.30k £355.59k £82.64k £101.45k £128.46k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £25.14k