Accounts and annual returns THE SOLENT DIABETES ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1141865
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2022 17 May 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 17 May 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 10 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 10 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 04 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 04 May 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 25 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 25 April 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2018 29 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 29 April 2019 On time Download Open in new window