Trustees THE SOLENT DIABETES ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1141865
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Robert Murray Trustee 04 November 2022
None on record
Professor Kenneth Martin Shaw Trustee 17 September 2017
None on record
David John Dick Trustee 17 February 2015
None on record
MRS C Edwards Trustee 04 March 2014
None on record
SYLVIA ROOT Trustee 25 January 2013
None on record