GLOBAL NCAP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TZF aims to promote public safety and public health, the protection and preservation of human life and the conservation, protection and improvement of the physical and natural environment. We support and conduct independent research and testing programmes that assess the safety and environmental characteristics of motor vehicles and their comparative performance for the general public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£3,424,394
Donations and legacies | £1.75m | |
Charitable activities | £1.67m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£4,554,133
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £4.55m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £4.55m |
People

2 Employee(s)
5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£90k to £100k | 1 |
£120k to £130k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
- Germany
- India
- Malaysia
- South Africa
- Uruguay
Governance
- 09 May 2011: Standard registration
- 29 April 2021: Funds received from 1153261 GLOBAL NEW CAR ASSESSMENT PROGRAMME
- GLOBAL NCAP (Working name)
- GLOBAL NEW CAR ASSESSMENT PROGRAMME (LIMITED BY GUARANTEE) (Previous name)
- Towards Zero Foundation (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Iain Cameron | Trustee | 11 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Michiel Van Ratingen | Trustee | 13 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Nirav Dumaswala | Trustee | 28 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr Anders Lie | Trustee | 28 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr ADRIAN KEITH LUND | Trustee | 25 March 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.85m | £3.61m | £2.53m | £4.75m | £3.42m | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.72m | £3.13m | £3.43m | £4.37m | £4.55m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £4.43m | £0 | £1.42m | £2.78m | £1.75m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £1.11m | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.43m | £3.61m | £0 | £1.96m | £1.67m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £4.72m | £2.80m | £3.43m | £4.37m | £4.55m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £44.60k | £38.43k | £21.43k | £28.90k | £32.46k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £585.98k | £2.77m | £430.16k | £381.33k | £472.07k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £323.86k | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £5.76k | £6.65k | £8.42k | £11.16k | £8.57k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £6.12m | £5.35m | £3.28m | £4.72m | £2.58m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £3.16m | £1.78m | £677.52k | £1.79m | £705.23k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 02 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 02 FEB 2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 01 JUN 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12 DEC 2018 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 09 JAN 2019 as amended on 08 Jan 2025
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY (“THE OBJECTS”) ARE FOR THE PROMOTION OF PUBLIC SAFETY AND PUBLIC HEALTH, AND FOR THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF HUMAN LIFE AND FOR THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT IN PARTICULAR BY: (A) PROMOTING INTERNATIONAL CO-OPERATION ON ROAD SAFETY, RECOMMENDING EFFECTIVE POLICIES AND PROGRAMMES AND THE APPLICATION OF BEST PRACTICES FOR ROAD INJURY PREVENTION BY GOVERNMENTS, PRIVATE SECTOR AND CIVIL SOCIETY IN SUPPORT OF A FUTURE IN WHICH ROADS ARE FREE FROM FATAL AND SERIOUS INJURIES THROUGH A SAFE SYSTEM; (B) ENCOURAGING INTERNATIONAL CO-OPERATION ON SUSTAINABLE MOBILITY AND EFFECTIVE POLICIES AND PROGRAMMES TO REDUCE ROAD TRANSPORT RELATED POLLUTANT EMISSIONS AND IMPROVE MOTOR VEHICLE FUEL EFFICIENCY; (C) CARRYING OUT RESEARCH ON ROAD SAFETY AND SUSTAINABLE MOBILITY POLICIES AND PROGRAMMES AND DISSEMINATING THE RESULTS TO THE PUBLIC; AND PROVIDING ADVICE AND INFORMATION TO THE PUBLIC, INTERNATIONAL INSTITUTIONS AND AGENCIES, GOVERNMENT DEPARTMENTS, LOCAL GOVERNMENT, EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS AND OTHER PUBLIC, VOLUNTARY AND CHARITABLE BODIES ON EFFECTIVE ROAD INJURY PREVENTION AND SUSTAINABLE MOBILITY POLICIES, AND PROGRAMMES; (D) PROMOTING AND CONDUCTING INDEPENDENT RESEARCH AND TESTING PROGRAMMES THAT WILL ASSESS THE SAFETY AND ENVIRONMENTAL CHARACTERISTICS OF MOTOR VEHICLES AND THEIR COMPARATIVE PERFORMANCE AND DISSEMINATING THE RESULTS TO THE PUBLIC; (E) PROMOTING THE DEVELOPMENT OF NEW CAR ASSESSMENT PROGRAMMES, BY PROVIDING FINANCIAL SUPPORT AND TECHNICAL ASSISTANCE, AND FACILITATING INTERNATIONAL CO-OPERATION WITH AND BETWEEN SUCH PROGRAMMES; AND (F) TO GIVE AWARDS TO RECOGNIZE ACHIEVEMENT IN EFFECTIVE ROAD INJURY PREVENTION AND SUSTAINABLE MOBILITY POLICIES, PROJECTS AND PROGRAMMES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
118 Pall Mall
London
SW1Y 5EA
- Phone:
- 01993881574
- Email:
- k.baker@globalncap.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window