SUPPORT THE EVANGELICAL FELLOWSHIP OF SIERRA LEONE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support EFSL gives financial and technical aid to the Sierra Leonean Christian community through the Evangelical Fellowship of Sierra Leone, EFSL, who help the local community with the chronic problems associated with ignorance and poverty. The activities are: Church and Community development, social institution development, education and training, reduction in unemployment and Public Health.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sierra Leone
Governance
- 31 March 2011: Standard registration
- SUPPORT EFSL (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Antoinette Wiebe | Trustee | 22 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Grace Christina Kenye Ensah | Trustee | 29 September 2018 |
|
|||||
Francis Magnus Memuyeh Ensah | Trustee | 12 May 2018 |
|
|||||
Kevin James Wiebe | Trustee | 27 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Harry Borbor Stevens | Trustee | 27 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rev Kenneth James Wiebe | Trustee | 16 January 2016 |
|
|||||
MR STEVE MANKTELOW BSC | Trustee | 05 July 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.81k | £22.88k | £33.97k | £20.35k | £22.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.09k | £24.71k | £29.92k | £17.59k | £22.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 17 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TrustDeed
Charitable objects
TO SUPPORT THE EVANGELICAL FELLOWSHIP OF SIERRA LEONE (EFSL) IN THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH THROUGH ITS PROGRAMS OF EVANGELISM, EDUCATION, PERSONAL AND COMMUNITY PROJECTS, IN PARTNERSHIP WITH AFFILIATED CHURCHES AND PARA-CHURCH ORGANISATIONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Blackdown Cottage
South View Road
Willand
Cullompton
EX15 2QH
- Phone:
- 01884820542
- Email:
- manktelowsteve@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window