SOLID ROCK TRIUMPHANT MINISTRY UK

Charity number: 1143444
Charity reporting is overdue by 24 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2020 Overdue Overdue by 24 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Overdue Overdue by 24 days
Annual return 31 October 2019 03 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2018 06 January 2020 128 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2017 06 January 2020 493 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2016 27 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 27 June 2017 On time Download