MOORFIELDS EYE CHARITY

Charity number: 1140679
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Other income £5.84m £6.92m £4.87m £7.08m £6.72m
Total expenditure £4.41m £9.24m £3.70m £4.10m £8.26m