BAYT MUHAMMAD ACADEMY

Charity number: 1141603
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/01/2016 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020
Total gross income £23.61k £22.80k £31.71k £44.95k £97.85k
Total expenditure £22.65k £26.09k £30.34k £36.09k £58.09k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A