SENTINEL LEISURE TRUST

Charity number: 1147896
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £5.38m £5.87m £6.57m £6.92m £6.23m
Total expenditure £5.19m £5.61m £6.56m £7.01m £6.36m
Income from government contracts £490.00k £411.26k £194.29k £123.87k £339.38k
Income from government grants £0 £92.84k £165.31k N/A £59.04k
Income - Donations and legacies £2.15k £8.40k £3.46k £2.03k £0
Income - Other trading activities £1.07m £1.08m £1.35m £1.57m £1.17m
Income - Charitable activities £4.31m £4.78m £5.22m £5.35m £3.75m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £1.31m
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.61m £4.93m £5.76m £6.21m £5.90m
Expenditure - Raising funds £586.21k £679.30k £797.34k £798.16k £459.75k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £12.81k £14.53k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0