Accounts and annual returns THE FRIENDS OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN CHURCH LETCHWORTH HERTFORDSHIRE

Charity number: 1141377
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 06 February 2025 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 08 February 2024 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 12 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 16 November 2021 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 13 November 2020 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required