Accounts and annual returns GUY PILKINGTON BENEFIT FUND

Charity number: 501684
Charity reporting is overdue by 142 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 142 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 142 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 21 February 2023 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 11 March 2022 39 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 March 2021 36 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 03 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required