Financial history GUY PILKINGTON BENEFIT FUND

Charity number: 501684
Charity reporting is overdue by 136 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £3.19k £160 £6.13k £104 £43
Total expenditure £2.83k £2.28k £2.52k £375 £324
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A