CHELMSFORD VINEYARD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Chelmsford Vineyard a Christian Church part of the Vineyard Chruches UK and Ireland. Operating principly to promote Chritianity and support the local community in the City of Chelmsford.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
Governance
- 22 August 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GAVIN JAMES COURTNEY | Chair | 29 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
Helen Waring | Trustee | 17 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Taylor | Trustee | 06 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM WOODWARD | Trustee | 30 March 2011 |
|
|||||
MARK RUSSELL MCLEAN | Trustee | 30 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
LIBBY WOODWARD | Trustee | 30 March 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £97.16k | £82.14k | £78.67k | £88.24k | £96.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £75.97k | £76.52k | £74.31k | £94.70k | £106.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £500 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 14 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 14 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 28 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 28 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 25 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 25 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 03/08/2011
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS ARE (I)THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH INCLUDING MISSIONARY ACTIVITIES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS AND ALSO INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, THE PLANTING OF NEW CHURCHES AND ORGANISATIONS OF CONGREGATIONS(II)THE RELIEF OF THE POOR AND NEEDY, AND THOSE WHO ARE AGED OR SICK, (III)THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION,(IV)SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECTS AND FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE BODIES AND INSTITUTIONS AS THE COMMITTEE SHALL THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SEE FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
34 EASTWOOD PARK
GREAT BADDOW
CHELMSFORD
CM2 8HF
- Phone:
- 01245474530
- Email:
- info@chelmsfordvineyard.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window