LIGHTHOUSE CHURCH OF GOD APOSTOLIC

Charity number: 1140633
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £71.30k £62.30k £115.43k £59.28k £78.29k
Total expenditure £65.30k £60.51k £81.29k £63.81k £75.19k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A