ALTOFTS COMMUNITY AND SPORTS FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting and facilitating health, social and community based opportunities for all residents in the wider Altofts area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £6,774 from 2 government grant(s)
People

12 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- City Of Wakefield
Governance
- 09 June 2011: Standard registration
- ALTOFTS COMMUNITY SPORTS FOUNDATION LIMITED (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID PARKER | Chair | 16 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
John Whalley | Trustee | 10 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Neil Greatorex | Trustee | 22 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Honey | Trustee | 22 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Widdop | Trustee | 26 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Paul Johnson | Trustee | 26 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Hepworth | Trustee | 26 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Greatorex | Trustee | 26 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alfie Norris | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Geoffery Holmes | Trustee | 01 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
PAUL GREATOREX | Trustee | 09 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
DAVID NORRIS | Trustee | 16 March 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £215.27k | £153.40k | £72.33k | £380.83k | £396.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £236.32k | £142.33k | £68.94k | £315.56k | £370.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £11.83k | £28.53k | £25.52k | £50.00k | £6.77k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 02 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 10/02/2011 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 29/11/2012
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF ALTOFTS AND SURROUNDING DISTRICTS BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PLAYING BOWLS, CRICKET AND FOOTBALL
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Brig
1 St Mary's Road
Normanton
WF6 2JH
- Phone:
- 07506611323
- Email:
- admin@acsf.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window