THE MAYOR OF LONDON'S FUND FOR YOUNG MUSICIANS

Charity number: 1141216
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £473.88k £452.97k £462.18k £451.63k £444.04k
Total expenditure £446.42k £432.41k £449.84k £532.16k £234.50k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £150.00k £24.00k £25.00k £26.00k