Accounts and annual returns THE MILLBY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1140985
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 19 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 19 July 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 02 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 02 June 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 15 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 28 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 28 June 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 06 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 06 June 2017 On time Download Open in new window