Financial history THE MILLBY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1140985
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £2.05m £61.95k £22.94k £352.89k £2.13m
Total expenditure £1.70m £268.76k £111.80k £25.68k £2.14m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £2.03m N/A N/A N/A £2.13m
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment £20.99k N/A N/A N/A £4.31k
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A £100
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.70m N/A N/A N/A £2.14m
Expenditure - Raising funds £2.68k N/A N/A N/A £2.67k
Expenditure - Governance £15.87k N/A N/A N/A £9.90k
Expenditure - Grants institution £1.69m N/A N/A N/A £2.13m
Expenditure - Investment management £2.68k N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A £0