Trustees Age Cymru West Glamorgan Limited
Charity number: 1140989
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Melvyn Clifford Rayner | Chair | 30 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Matthew Jobling | Trustee | 09 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sophia Elizabeth Miller | Trustee | 09 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kirsty Leanne Davies | Trustee | 09 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Ford | Trustee | 09 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Monica Sophia Vasquez | Trustee | 10 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Natasha May Fulford | Trustee | 20 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Craig Lawton | Trustee | 07 February 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.