TOM'S TRUST

Charity number: 1142670
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 29 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 29 April 2021 On time
Annual return 30 June 2019 29 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 29 March 2020 On time
Annual return 30 June 2018 03 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 03 April 2019 On time
Annual return 30 June 2017 19 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 19 April 2018 On time
Annual return 30 June 2016 19 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 19 April 2017 On time