TOM'S TRUST

Charity number: 1142670
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £204.07k £137.31k £143.84k £218.85k £266.83k
Total expenditure £192.32k £129.70k £141.12k £189.27k £290.18k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A