SOUTHWARK DAY CENTRE FOR ASYLUM SEEKERS

Charity number: 1143912
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £213.16k £176.54k £174.69k £215.25k £279.60k
Total expenditure £191.06k £184.56k £183.59k £182.81k £189.07k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £82.67k £45.32k £45.32k £45.32k £45.32k