THE ORP FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1140855
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 25 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 25 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 17 March 2020 41 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 17 March 2020 41 days late Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 28 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 28 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 27 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 25 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2016 21 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 21 January 2017 On time Download