Accounts and annual returns JAFLAS

Charity number: 1142202
Regulatory alert
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 22 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 16 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 13 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 09 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 29 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required