ZONTA LONDON FUND

Charity number: 1143825
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 08 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 12 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 19 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 12 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 24 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required