South Wales Law Centre

Charity number: 1140949
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £327.60k £352.32k £356.20k £250.38k £270.95k
Total expenditure £330.07k £351.01k £348.43k £291.28k £244.27k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £90.00k £90.00k £0 £90.00k £86.27k