AL-KHAYR ACADEMY

Charity number: 1142696
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2020 03 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2020 03 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 01 April 2019 10 October 2020 252 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2019 10 October 2020 252 days late Download
Annual return 01 April 2018 19 June 2019 138 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2018 19 June 2019 138 days late Download
Annual return 01 April 2017 17 April 2018 75 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2017 17 April 2018 75 days late Download
Annual return 01 April 2016 08 March 2017 35 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2016 08 March 2017 35 days late Download