AL-KHAYR ACADEMY

Charity number: 1142696
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 01/04/2016 01/04/2017 01/04/2018 01/04/2019 01/04/2020
Total gross income £75.59k £87.26k £79.44k £147.26k £85.16k
Total expenditure £8.56k £7.28k £5.00k £10.67k £20.73k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A