SCIENCE MEDIA CENTRE

Charity number: 1140827
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £576.34k £561.37k £626.81k £579.77k £584.91k
Total expenditure £520.96k £543.94k £554.85k £553.76k £545.11k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £30.00k £40.00k £30.00k £40.00k £40.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £554.58k £550.03k £616.46k £569.06k £583.08k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £20.00k £10.00k £10.00k £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.76k £1.34k £353 £713 £1.83k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £10.00k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £490.20k £511.61k £520.77k £519.08k £510.02k
Expenditure - Raising funds £30.76k £32.33k £34.08k £34.69k £35.09k
Expenditure - Governance £14.72k £13.87k £14.00k £0 £14.72k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0