SCIENCE MEDIA CENTRE

Charity number: 1140827
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JONATHAN BAKER Chair 04 March 2013 None on record
Dr PAUL BROOKER Trustee 20 October 2017 None on record
Jonathan Bruun Trustee 08 October 2020
SENSE ABOUT SCIENCE Received: On time
John Davidson Trustee 19 June 2019
NOAH'S ARK CHILDREN'S VENTURE Received: On time
ADRIAN BULL Trustee 21 October 2016 None on record
Karen Chadwick Trustee 21 September 2016 None on record
Gavin Allen Trustee 08 October 2020 None on record
Prof Ann Jacqueline Hunter Trustee 19 June 2019 None on record
Prof Kevin McConway Trustee 09 November 2018 None on record
Alex Keenlyside Trustee 08 October 2020 None on record