SOCIETY OF THE FRIENDS OF CHESTER CATHEDRAL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Assisting the Dean and Chapter in furthering the religious and charitable work of Chester Cathedral by supporting the spiritual life, work and worship, and maintaining, improving, adding to and repairing the fabric, fittings, furniture, ornaments, services and music.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
People
9 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cheshire West & Chester
Governance
- 07 July 1972: Standard registration
- THE FRIENDS OF CHESTER CATHEDRAL (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN CECIL DAVIES | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|||||
JANE JONES | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Kenneth Llewellyn Lewis | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Dr Dorothy Anne King | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Judith Dawn Elizabeth Potter | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Cross | Trustee | 21 June 2019 |
|
|||||
Mr Bill Amos | Trustee | 26 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Barry Marshall Ingram | Trustee | 19 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS JOHN FRY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.76k | £35.70k | £20.44k | £18.19k | £75.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £59.91k | £29.04k | £21.99k | £11.71k | £174.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 September 2023 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 September 2023 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 August 2022 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 September 2021 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 September 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 14 September 2020 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 17 October 2019 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | 17 October 2019 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 03/07/1939 AS AMENDED 16/06/1984 AND 5/5/1998.
Charitable objects
TO ASSIST AND SUPPORT THE DEAN AND CHAPTER IN FURTHERING THE RELIGIOUS AND CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CATHEDRAL CHURCH OF CHRIST AND THE BLESSED VIRGIN MARY IN CHESTER:- (A) STRENGTHENING AND MAINTAINING THE SPIRITUAL LIFE, WORK AND WORSHIP OF THE CATHEDRAL. (B) ASSISTING AND SUPPORTING THE DEAN AND CHAPTER IN MAINTAINING, IMPROVING, ADDING TO AND REPAIRING THE FABRIC, FITTINGS, FURNITURE, ORNAMENTS, SERVICES AND MUSIC OF THE CATHEDRAL. (C) PUBLISHING LITERATURE FURTHERING THE OBJECTS OF THE SOCIETY INCLUDING AN ANNUAL REPORT (D) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE SOCIETY MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT
Area of benefit
CHESTER
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 Abbey Square
CHESTER
CH1 2HU
- Phone:
- 01244324756
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window