HOPSCOTCH CARE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1143199
Charity reporting is overdue by 206 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2020 Overdue Overdue by 206 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Overdue Overdue by 206 days
Annual return 31 May 2019 26 May 2020 56 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 29 May 2020 59 days late Download
Annual return 31 May 2018 22 May 2020 418 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2017 28 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2016 06 April 2017 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2016 Not Required