Trustees KERALA ARTS AND LITERARY ASSOCIATION (KALA)

Charity number: 1144122
Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Nisha Ramkumar Trustee 27 March 2021
None on record
Shankar Meembat Trustee 04 July 2020
None on record
Govindan Vishnu Nampoothiri Trustee 04 July 2020
None on record
Dr Prathap Lalitha Bai Chellappan Pillai Trustee 04 July 2020
None on record
Padmanabha Pillai Sreeram Trustee 15 March 2019
None on record
Jeevan Nambully Trustee 15 March 2019
None on record
Vipin Selvaraj Playikovilakam Venkitachalam Trustee 15 March 2019
None on record
Dr Seena Praveen Trustee 08 July 2018
None on record
Kurupath Sathyanath Sreekumar Trustee 02 July 2018
None on record
Renuka Nair Trustee 28 March 2015
None on record
Jayasree Chandramohan Trustee 21 March 2015
None on record
GOPAL NETUVELI Trustee 29 March 2011
None on record
Dr SUKUMARAN P K NAIR Trustee 29 March 2011
None on record