Financial history A LITTLE GESTURE A GREAT HELP

Charity number: 1141990
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £79.94k £144.26k £60.80k £99.97k £101.98k
Total expenditure £52.93k £82.94k £108.64k £90.09k £78.62k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A