THE LANCASTER AND DISTRICT BIRD WATCHING SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of the public in the knowledge, understanding and appreciation of birds and bird study in the Lancaster & District Area. To undertake population studies of birds within the Area and support the national and regional surveys organised by the BTO. Information is published, via its annual bird report, newsletters, website, and through a programme of indoor meetings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2020
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Lancashire
Governance
- 20 February 1974: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Kevin Briggs | Chair | 01 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
MR ROBIN HORNER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBIN HORNER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.13k | £2.10k | £1.91k | £2.34k | £1.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.80k | £1.91k | £1.86k | £2.32k | £1.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 312 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 312 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 678 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 678 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1043 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1043 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 16 March 2022 | 259 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 16 March 2022 | 624 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES AS AMENDED 31 JANUARY 1974
Charitable objects
A) TO ORGANISE SURVEYS OR SELECTED SPECIES IN THE AREA EITHER INDEPENDENTLY OR AS PART OF A NATURAL SCHEME AND TO MAKE PUBLIC THE RESULT OF SUCH SURVEYS. B) TO ENCOURAGE THE SUBMISSION OF NEST RECORDS UNDER THE SCHEME OF THE BRITISH TRUST FOR ORNITHOLOGY. C) TO COLLECT INFORMATION ON THE MIGRATION AND BEHAVIOUR OF BIRDS AND ON THE APPEARANCE OF UNUSUAL SPECIES AND TO MAKE PUBLIC THE RESULTS OF SUCH SURVEYS. D) DURING THE WINTER, TO HOLD TWO OR THREE MEETINGS TO DISCUSS EXPERIENCES AND TO HEAR PAPERS OR SEE FILMS PRESENTED BY THE MEMBERS. IF DEMAND SO WARRANTS, TO ARRANGE PERIODICAL TALKS BY EXPERTS. E) TO UNDERTAKE ANY OTHER ACTIVITY DECIDED BY THE SOCIETY AT A GENERAL MEETING WHICH IS DEEMED ONLY TO BE OF A CHARITABLE NATURE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 REDMAYNE DRIVE
CARNFORTH
LA5 9XA
- Phone:
- 07762053146
- Email:
- robin.horner@btconnect.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window