CROSSWORLD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Crossworld runs a range of fooball-related projects for young people who are seeking or have sought asylum in the UK in order to equip them to live productive and fulfilling lives. Crossworld's projects include a weekly drop-in project, and weekly training sessions and competitive matches for our eleven-a-side football team. We also run a series of summer activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Croydon
- Lambeth
- Merton
- Southwark
- Wandsworth
Governance
- 20 April 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JULIAN WILD | Chair | 27 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
HAFIZ MUSTAFAEY | Trustee | 03 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
KENZO FRY | Trustee | 03 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
BEN BRYANT | Trustee | 20 April 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.47k | £4.51k | £176 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.32k | £2.57k | £1.22k | £60 | £60 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 October 2024 | 274 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 April 2023 | 70 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
Constitution
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF CROSSWORLD ARE TO HELP CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WHO ARE SEEKING OR HAVE SOUGHT ASYLUM IN THE UNITED KINGDOM, INCLUDING THOSE DEFINED AS UNACCOMPANIED ASYLUM-SEEKING CHILDREN, ESPECIALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES IN THE LONDON AREA, ESPECIALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY FOOTBALL, THAT DEVELOP THE CAPACITIES, CAPABILITIES AND SKILLS OF THOSE PERSONS SO AS TO: A. IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THOSE PERSONS; B. PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF THOSE PERSONS; AND C. ENABLE THOSE PERSONS TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 5
Anerley Court
Anerley Park
LONDON
SE20 8NN
- Phone:
- 07890850952
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window